Jansen, Liesbet Marye (CPSO#: 70201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6361 8th Line
Egbert, Ontario
Egbert ON  L0L 1N0
Phone: 705-440-6815
Fax: 705-458-9765
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

21 Kingsmere Court
Alliston ON  L9R-0B7
Canada
Phone: (705) 250-1561
Fax: 705-250-1370
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Liesbet Jansen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Jansen ( CPSO# 70201 )

Business Address:
6361 8th Line
Egbert ON  L0L 1N0
Phone Number: (705) 458-1499

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LIESBET MARYE JANSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANSEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1998