Jansen, Lisa Elena (CPSO#: 70419)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: Miceli, Lisa Elena (used until: 24 Jul 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Building 400 - Suite 160
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone: (519) 258-4142
Fax: (519) 985-1084
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 109
2462 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Canada
Phone: (519) 258-7181
Fax: (519) 985-1084
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jansen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Jansen ( CPSO# 70419 )

Business Address:
Building 400 - Suite 160
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone Number: (519) 258-4145

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA ELENA JANSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANSEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1998