Jansz, Gwenderlyn Frances (CPSO#: 63671)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Jamestown Health Centre
Ground Floor
410 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1K2
Phone: (416) 864-3096
Fax: (416) 864-6035
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GWENDERLYN FRANCES JANSZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANSZ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 1992