Jany, Mark Joseph (CPSO#: 62181)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Apr 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 9
235 Martindale Road
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A5
Phone: (905) 984-3349
Fax: (905) 984-5110
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Jany Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jany ( CPSO# 62181 )

Business Address:
Suite 9
235 Martindale Road
St Catharines ON  L2W 1A5
Phone Number: (905) 984-3349

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 16 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK JOSEPH JANY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1990 to 14 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Respiratory Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1992