Janzen, Kathryn Jane (CPSO#: 88786)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: Chan, Kathryn Jane (used until: 27 Jun 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
555 Prince Charles Drive North
Welland ON  L3C 6B5
Phone: (905) 735-0725
Fax: (905) 735-8184
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHRYN JANE JANZEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANZEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2010