Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Jariani, Marjan (CPSO#: 68631)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Sep 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800 Ext. 3242
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marjan Jariani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jariani ( CPSO# 68631 )

Business Address:
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street
Suite EN3-435
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARJAN JARIANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JARIANI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 22 Dec 1995
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 23 Dec 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2000
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2002