Jarman, Paul Gerard (CPSO#: 87528)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Sydney, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2007 to 18 Oct 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2008