Jaroszynska, Anna Maria (CPSO#: 72140)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 May 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 210
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 582 4111
Fax: (289) 837 1007
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anna Maria Jaroszynska Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jaroszynska ( CPSO# 72140 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 837-4111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 07 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNA MARIA JAROSZYNSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAROSZYNSKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 6 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 04 Feb 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 6 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 May 1998