Jaroszynski, Grzegorz (CPSO#: 71989)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Oct 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Oct 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Lodz, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 23A
2nd Floor
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone: (905) 333-5020
Fax: (905) 333-5018
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Jaroszynski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Jaroszynski ( CPSO# 71989 )

Business Address:
Unit 23A
2nd Floor
1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 333-5020

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 10 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRZEGORZ JAROSZYNSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAROSZYNSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 1997