Jarvi, Keith Allen (CPSO#: 50845)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6th Floor Box 19
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8867
Fax: (416) 586-8354
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Keith Jarvi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 07 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Lee ( CPSO# 63239 )
Dr. K. Jarvi ( CPSO# 50845 )

Business Address:
60 Murray Street
6th Floor
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-8867

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 13 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEITH ALLEN JARVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JARVI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 14 Jun 1982 to 13 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1984