Jarvis, Christopher Anthony Neville (CPSO#: 27774)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, German

Education:University of London, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Sep 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 2009