Jarvis, Dorothy Marin Eirene Anna (CPSO#: 29582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital For Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-4915
Fax: (416) 813-5043
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOROTHY MARIN EIRENE ANNA JARVIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JARVIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Dec 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1977