Jarvis, Tanya Joy (CPSO#: 76211)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 26 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 06 Jul 2001
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Jul 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2001
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2003