Jasey, Gregory Said (CPSO#: 69364)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Apr 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Apr 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
13278 Tecumseh Road
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Phone: (519) 735-9800
Fax: (519) 735-8448
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 106
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Canada
Phone: (519) 254-5763
Fax: (519) 254-6356
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory Jasey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Jasey ( CPSO# 69364 )

Business Address:
North Walkerville Medical Centre
106 - 2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone Number: (519) 254-4992

Business Address:
Suite 208
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8N 3T6
Phone Number: (519) 254-5763

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY SAID JASEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JASEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2001