Jasey, Kathleen Ann (CPSO#: 74745)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: Van Hooren, Kathleen Ann (used until: 09 Dec 2002 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Walkerville Medical Centre
121-2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone: (519) 252-4994
Fax: (519) 252-4995
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kathleen Jasey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Jasey ( CPSO# 74745 )

Business Address:
South Walkerville Medical Centre
Suite 121
2224 Walker Road
Windsor ON  N8W 5L7
Phone Number: (519) 252-4994

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHLEEN ANN JASEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JASEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2002