Jaskolka, Jeffrey David (CPSO#: 76048)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Department Of Medical Imaging
2100 Bouvaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: 9054942120 Ext. 50334
Fax: 9054946614
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Jaskolka Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jaskolka ( CPSO# 76048 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health Care
Department of Medical Imaging
2100 Bouvaird Drive
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY DAVID JASKOLKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JASKOLKA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2007