Jassal, Sarbjit Vanita (CPSO#: 68530)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, German, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Nephrology
University Health Network
8Nu-857
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3196
Fax: (416) 340-4999
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Rehabilitiation Institute
Dialysis Unit
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Canada
Phone: (416) 597-3422
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vanita Jassal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Jassal ( CPSO# 68530 )

Business Address:
Divison of Nephrology
University Health Network
Room 8NU-857
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3196

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 03 Feb 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARBJIT VANITA JASSAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JASSAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1996
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Aug 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2001