Jastaniah, Amro Suleiman A (CPSO#: 108840)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
Schulich School of Medicine
University of Western Ontario
Room M106 Medical Science Building
London ON  N6A 5C1
Electoral District: 02

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 May 2016 to 28 May 2016
PEAP - Resident - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 29 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Nov 2017 to 29 Nov 2017
PEAP - Resident - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 30 Nov 2017 to 15 Jan 2018
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 May 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 May 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016