Jastrzebska, Jolanta Grazyna (CPSO#: 53763)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Warsaw, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Dr. Jastrzebska has advised the College that she has transferred her medical records to Dr. Zaki at: Unit #3 2083 Lake Shore Blvd West Toronto, Ontario M8V 7G2 Tel: 416-252-7775 Fax: 416-252-1775
Date Received: 13 Apr 2011

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Mar 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2014