Jauhari, Vinod (CPSO#: 84899)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Dr. S. N. Medical College, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Whitby Medical centre
3975 Garden Street
Whitby ON  L1R 3A4
Phone: (905) 430-2400
Fax: (905) 430-1599
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Road Medical Centre
Markham ON  L3S 3J8
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7400
Fax: (905) 472-9009
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Jauhari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 06 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Jauhari ( CPSO# 84899 )

Business Address:
7160 Markham Road
Markham ON  L3S 3J8
Phone Number: (905) 472-7400

Business Address:
North Whitby Medical Centre
3975 Garden Street
Whitby ON  L1R 3A4
Phone Number: (905) 430-2400

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINOD JAUHARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAUHARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2008