Javanmard, Mahgol (CPSO#: 76232)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit A 8
1390 Major Mackenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0A1
Phone: (905) 884-7711
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mahgol Javanmard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 29 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Javanmard ( CPSO# 76232 )

Business Address:
Unit A8
1390 Major MacKenzie Drive East
Richmond Hill ON  L4S 0A1
Phone Number: (905) 884-7711

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHGOL JAVANMARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAVANMARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2003