Javid, Seyed Mahmoud (CPSO#: 74477)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 13 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jan 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 13 Jan 2002
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jan 2002