Javidnia, Hedyeh (CPSO#: 86256)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Smyth Medical Centre
Suite 302
1929 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3
Phone: (613) 867-6673
Fax: (613) 741-8800
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hedyeh Javidnia Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Javidnia ( CPSO# 86256 )

Business Address:
Smyth Medical Center
Suite 302
1929 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3
Phone Number: (613) 526-5737

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 15 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HEDYEH JAVIDNIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAVIDNIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2014