Javier, Romulo Esguerra (CPSO#: 50846)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Sep 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
2444 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V1
Phone: (905) 897-0949
Fax: (905) 290-9185
Electoral District: 05

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROMULO ESGUERRA JAVIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAVIER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 May 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Aug 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1985