Jawad, Ahmed Ebrahim Akbar (CPSO#: 87892)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Apr 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Univerzity P.J. Safarika, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Division of Surgical Oncology
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4200
Electoral District: 10

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Nov 2007 to 21 Jan 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

McMaster University, 22 Jan 2008 to 30 Apr 2008
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2008