Jawahir, George Amarnauth (CPSO#: 54462)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. George Jawahir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 7 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Arbour Medical 281 Stone Road East Guelph ON N1G 5J5 attn Office Manager
Date Received: 02 Jun 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Nov 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2016

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Fitness To Practise
Decision Date: 26 Apr 1996
Summary:

 The Fitness to Practise Committee finds that Dr. Jawahir is an incapacitated member of the College 
 of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario pursuant to subsection 69(1) of the Health Professions 
 Procedural Code and it is desirable in the public interest that Dr. Jawahir(s practice be 
 restricted. The Fitness to Practise Committee, on April 28, 1998, ordered that the Order of the 
 Committee dated April 26, 1996, be replaced with certain of terms and conditions

On April 6, 
 2000, the Fitness to Practise Committee heard a motion to vacate the order of the Fitness to 
 Practise Committee, dated September 30, 1998, and replace it with an acknowledgement and 
 undertaking executed by Dr. Jawahir.  The Committee ordered that the Fitness to Practise 
 Committee(s orderer dated September 30, 1998 be vacated upon the execution of the Acknowledgement 
 and Undertaking and Consent.

Appeal: No Appeal