Jawaid, Mehvish (CPSO#: 96875)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Aug 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Aug 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Malton Medical Group
Unit 201
6870 Goreway Drive
Mississauga ON  L4V 1P1
Phone: (905) 677-4200
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mehvish Jawaid Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Jawaid ( CPSO# 96875 )

Business Address:
Malton Medical Group
201 - 6870 Goreway Drive
Mississauga ON  L4V 1P1
Phone Number: (905) 677-4200

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 May 2013 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 31 Oct 2011
Elective Trainee - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 12 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 12 Jun 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 23 May 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 22 May 2014 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.   Mehvish  Jawaid  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  Family
                  Medicine, only.