Jawas, Ali Mohammed (CPSO#: 71774)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tawam Hospital
UAE University
P.O. Box 17666
Al Ain 00000
United Arab Emirates
Phone: 9713 7137563

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

United Arab Emirates

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 09 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI MOHAMMED JAWAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAWAS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Sep 2005
Clinical Fellow - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2006