Jay, Venita (CPSO#: 54908)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: Jagadha, Venkita Narayana (used until: 24 Nov 1994 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Delhi, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 08 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016