Jayaram, Srinidhi Kadamby (CPSO#: 88219)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 302
73 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone: (519) 822-4521
Fax: (519) 822-0030
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Srinidhi Jayaram and Serina Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Patel ( CPSO# 85756 )
Dr. S. Jayaram ( CPSO# 88219 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Suite 302
73 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone Number: (519) 822-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 25 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SRINIDHI KADAMBY JAYARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAYARAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 07 Apr 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 27 Jul 2008
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 25 Aug 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Elective Trainee - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 6 - Vascular Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 7 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010