Jayasuriya, Dheemathie Sushila (CPSO#: 50847)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Dec 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Ceylon, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
A6
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4581
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Sri Lanka

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DHEEMATHIE SUSHILA JAYASURIYA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAYASURIYA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 1986