Jayatilaka, Padmali Udayani (CPSO#: 95157)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

Expiry Date:  07 May 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Colombo, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Family Medicine
McMaster University
2nd Floor
100 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone: (905) 525 9140
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Sri Lanka

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PADMALI UDAYANI JAYATILAKA shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. JAYATILAKA is enrolled at MCMASTER UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. JAYATILAKA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. JAYATILAKA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. JAYATILAKA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. JAYATILAKA is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. JAYATILAKA no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 07 May 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 31 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 06 Feb 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 07 Feb 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 31 Aug 2017 to 23 Oct 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Oct 2017 to 07 May 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 May 2018