Jayawardene, Nishan Chetiya (CPSO#: 72587)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PromptDoc Urgent Care Clinic
523 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 2H2
Phone: (905) 646-0015
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

582 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 0A2
Canada
Phone: (905) 935-1800
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nishan Jayawardene Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jayawardene ( CPSO# 72587 )

Business Address:
PromptDoc Urgent Care Clinic
523 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 4H4
Phone Number: (905) 646-0015

Business Address:
582 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 935-1800


Corporation Name: Dalgleish Jayawardene & Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 12 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NISHAN CHETIYA JAYAWARDENE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAYAWARDENE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2000