Jaychuk, Gregory Alexander (CPSO#: 54381)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6H6
Phone: (519)464-4400
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gregory A. Jaychuk Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Jaychuk ( CPSO# 54381 )

Business Address:
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY ALEXANDER JAYCHUK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAYCHUK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1984 to 14 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1985