Jean-Baptiste, Andre (CPSO#: 24176)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 May 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Haiti, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1971
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Mar 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 May 1995