Jeans, Elizabeth Rosanne (CPSO#: 61094)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
425 Locust Street
Burlington ON  L7S 1T8
Phone: (905) 340-0401
Fax: (905) 340-0426
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elizabeth Rose Jeans Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 07 Sep 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 04 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ROSANNE JEANS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEANS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 6 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1992