Jechel, Peter (CPSO#: 54018)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Perth Medical Clinic
14 Isabella Street
Perth ON  K7H 2W6
Phone: (613) 267-5556
Fax: (613) 267-2641
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Perth and Smiths Falls
District Hospital - Perth Site
60 Cornelia Street
Smiths Falls ON  K7A 2H9
Canada
Phone: (613) 267-1500
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter Jechel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Jechel ( CPSO# 54018 )

Business Address:
14 Isabella Street
Perth ON  K7H 2W6
Phone Number: (613) 267-5556

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Great War Memorial Site-Perth Perth
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER JECHEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JECHEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1985