Jeejeebhoy, Farida Mary (CPSO#: 68804)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
164 Queen St East
Brampton
Brampton ON  L6V1B4
Phone: (905) 451-0185
Fax: (905) 451-4743
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

581 Davis Drive
Suite 602B
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Canada
Phone: 905-953-7917
Fax: 905-953-0046
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Farida Jeejeebhoy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Jeejeebhoy ( CPSO# 68804 )

Business Address:
209-164 Queen Street East
Brampton ON  L8V 1B4
Phone Number: (905) 451-0185

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 30 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FARIDA MARY JEEJEEBHOY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEEJEEBHOY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1999