Jeeva, Shabeer Ahmed (CPSO#: 51016)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English, Gujarati

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
13-15 Scott Street
Waverley
Benmore Gauteng 2010
South Africa
Phone: +27114404425
Fax: +27114404414
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

16 goldring crescent
Markham ON  L6C 1Y6
Canada
Phone: (416) 540-1212
Fax: 9054030323
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

South Africa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 25 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHABEER AHMED JEEVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEEVA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 09 May 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1985
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2014