Jeevan, Dhruve Satish (CPSO#: 104539)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oxford University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Sep 2015
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2015