Jeeves, Nicholas Guy (CPSO#: 62587)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mindemoya Medical Clinic
2120B Hwy 551
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1S0
Phone: (705) 377-5371
Fax: (705) 377-5372
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicholas Jeeves Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Jeeves ( CPSO# 62587 )

Business Address:
Mindemoya Medical Clinic
2120B Higway 551
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 377-5371

Business Address:
Mindemoya Hospital
2120A - Highway 551
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 377-5311

Business Address:
M'Chigeeng Health Centre
689A Highway 551
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1G0
Phone Number: (705) 377-5347


Corporation Name: Stadnyk Jeeves Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Al Hadi ( CPSO# 84378 )
Dr. A. Stadnyk ( CPSO# 33598 )
Dr. M. Reade ( CPSO# 77096 )
Dr. K. O'Connor ( CPSO# 72515 )
Dr. N. Jeeves ( CPSO# 62587 )
Dr. M. Harelnikava ( CPSO# 99499 )

Business Address:
2120B Highway 551
P.O. Box 150
Mindemoya ON  P0P 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 377-5371

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Northwest Territories
Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Espanola General Hospital Espanola
Manitoulin Health Centre Little Current
Manitoulin Health Centre,Mindemoya Site Mindemoya
North Shore Health Network Blind River
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS GUY JEEVES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEEVES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1992