Jeeves, William Patrick (CPSO#: 64047)

Current Status: Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 08 Oct 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Oct 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1993
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 08 Oct 2003

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 08 Oct 2003
Summary:

 On October 8, 2003, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Jeeves committed an act of professional 
 misconduct in that he sexually abused a patient, and that and he engaged in acts relevant to the 
 practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.  The Committee ordered a reprimand, the fact of the 
 reprimand to be recorded on the Register and that Dr. Jeeves( certificate of registration be 
 revoked immediately.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Oct 08, 2003