Jefferies, John William Tasker (CPSO#: 23609)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 22 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 22 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Jefferies Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 11 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 197 Belmoral Drive, Orillia, ON L3V 5P9
Date Received: 19 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jun 2015