Jefferson, Debra Lynn (CPSO#: 59956)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
87 Mill Street North
Newcastle ON  L1B 1H8
Phone: (905) 987-1896
Fax: (905) 987-9894
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Debra L. Jefferson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Jefferson ( CPSO# 59956 )

Business Address:
87 Mill Street North
Newcastle ON  L1B 1H8
Phone Number: (905) 987-1896

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Clarington Site Bowmanville
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBRA LYNN JEFFERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEFFERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1989