Jefford, Cheryl Lynn (CPSO#: 78058)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 26 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 26 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: Morgan, Cheryl Lynn (used until: 15 Jan 2003 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nuclear Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 6 - Nuclear Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Jun 2007