Jeffrey, John Frederick (CPSO#: 32793)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Victory 4
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-6071
Fax: (613) 548-1330
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Jeffrey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 30 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Jeffrey ( CPSO# 32793 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Victory 4
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-6071

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 02 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN FREDERICK JEFFREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEFFREY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1993