Jeffries, Eric (CPSO#: 42019)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Apr 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jan 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013