Jeffries, Joseph Joel (CPSO#: 23337)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Dec 1970

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 1970

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Center for Addiction
and Mental Health
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone: (416) 979-6863
Fax: (416) 979-6815
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH JOEL JEFFRIES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEFFRIES is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1970