Jegatheeswaran, Rajadurai (CPSO#: 69500)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Colombo, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
3420 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1W 2R6
Phone: (416) 498-3452
Fax: (416) 498-9307
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJADURAI JEGATHEESWARAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JEGATHEESWARAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1997