Jeje, Oluyemi Majekodunmi (CPSO#: 43456)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 14 May 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 May 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 3 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Nov 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 27 Nov 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 25 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 May 2015